IL HB4966 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Defines "quality of care concerns". Allows an applicant for a foster family home license with quality of care concerns who has previously been licensed to operate a child care facility or has provided relative foster care to a child placed by the Department to submit a preliminary application to the Department of Children and Family Services. Allows the Department to issue a foster family home license to an applicant with quality of care concerns if the applicant meets certain requirements and the Department is satisfied that the foster family home does not pose a risk to children and that the foster family home will be able to meet the physical and emotional needs of children. Provides that, if the Department approves a preliminary application, the foster family shall submit a standard application to the Department. Creates provisions for renewing the license for a foster family home with quality of care concerns. Requires a foster home to wait 5 years before applying for another license if it is revoked, is surrendered for cause, expires or is surrendered with certain holds in place or investigations pending, or the Department refuses to renew the license. Makes other changes.
Title
FOSTER HOME-QUALITY OF CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0779 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-02-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 2.22a | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |