IL HB4958 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,000,000 to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to make grants to child care providers who offer non-traditional hours of care for the children of first responders and trade workers. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$DCEO-CHILD CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4958&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4958.pdf |