IL HB4952 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Re-assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |