IL HB4938 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a warming center shall be established and maintained in each township and municipality with a population over 5,000, except in a township and municipality coterminous or substantially coterminous, where one warming center may be established and maintained jointly. Limits municipal home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
MUNI/TOWNSHIP-WARMING CENTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 85-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-20-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4938&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4938.htm |