IL HB4926 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Prohibits a landlord from charging a prospective tenant an application screening fee if the prospective tenant provides a reusable tenant screening report that meets the following criteria: (i) the report was prepared within the previous 30 days by a consumer credit reporting agency at the request and expense of a prospective tenant; (ii) the report is made directly available to a landlord for use in the rental application process or is provided through a third-party website that regularly engages in the business of providing a reusable tenant screening report and complies with all state and federal laws pertaining to use and disclosure of information contained in a consumer report by a consumer credit reporting agency; and (iii) the report is available to the landlord at no cost to access or use.
Title
LANDLORD-TENANT CREDIT REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0840 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 070-038-000 |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 011-004-000 |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Housing |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-017-001 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-002-001 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-043-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-005-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |