IL HB4923 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Act. Provides that an investment option may be a conservative fund rather than a conservative principal protection fund. Provides that the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Board may establish deadlines for payment of payroll deductions to the Fund. Provides for audits on a fiscal year basis rather than a calendar year basis and report by the following January rather than July. Requires the Treasurer to prepare annual reports on benefits provided by the Program and post the report on the Program website. Effective immediately.
Title
SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS OPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 80 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |