IL HB4897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to sell beer manufactured by any other brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to non-licensees and to sell cider. Authorizes a distributor licensee to sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Provides that (i) a person licensed to make wine under the laws of another state who has a winery shipper's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine or (ii) a person who has a first-class or second-class wine manufacturer's license, a first-class or second-class wine-maker's license, or a limited wine manufacturer's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine may make application to the Commission for a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of wine to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-BREWERS-SALE AT RETAIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0816
2018-08-13HouseEffective Date August 13, 2018
2018-08-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 106-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 106-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Muñoz
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-18SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePostponed - Executive
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-001
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23555-1Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4897&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0816.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4897sam003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4897_04272018_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4897_05252018_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4897sam003_05312018_069001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4897sam002_05312018_069000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback