IL HB4897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0816
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to sell beer manufactured by any other brewer, class 1 brewer, or class 2 brewer to non-licensees and to sell cider. Authorizes a distributor licensee to sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Provides that (i) a person licensed to make wine under the laws of another state who has a winery shipper's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine or (ii) a person who has a first-class or second-class wine manufacturer's license, a first-class or second-class wine-maker's license, or a limited wine manufacturer's license and annually produces less than 25,000 gallons of wine may make application to the Commission for a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of wine to brewers, class 1 brewers, and class 2 brewers that, pursuant to a specified provision of the Act, sell beer, cider, or both beer and cider to non-licensees at their breweries. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-BREWERS-SALE AT RETAIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0816 |
2018-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Muñoz |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-001 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |