IL HB4897 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the disabled veterans exemption and the disabled veterans standard homestead exemption must be reestablished every 2 years (instead of on an annual basis). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-VETERANS EXEMPT
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4897&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4897.htm |