IL HB4892 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Allows a member to establish service credit for up to 12 days of voluntary or involuntary furlough, beginning on or after July 1, 2010 and ending on or before June 30, 2011, used to address a State fiscal emergency. Provides that no additional contribution is required for this credit. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-FURLOUGH CREDITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-02-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4892&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4892.htm |