IL HB4885 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a restaurant shall, by default, include a specified type of water, milk, or juice with a children's meal sold by the restaurant. Provides that a restaurant may include another beverage with a children's meal upon request. Requires the Department of Public Health to implement, administer, and enforce the amendatory provisions and allows the Department to adopt any rules it deems necessary for the implementation, administration, and enforcement.
Title
RESTAURANTS-CHILD BEVERAGES
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4885&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4885.htm |