IL HB4872 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2020 direct support persons wages shall be increased by $2 per hour, and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Requires the Department to increase rates and reimbursements in effect on January 1, 2020 for community-based providers for persons with developmental disabilities in order to fund, at a minimum, a $2 per hour wage increase. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for facilities ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities, the rates taking effect within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall include an increase sufficient to provide a $2 per hour wage increase for non-executive front-line personnel, including, but not limited to, other specified staff and support personnel. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to increase the rates for ID/DD facilities and MC/DD facilities taking effect for services delivered on or after January 1, 2020 to provide a minimum $2 per hour wage increase over the wages in effect on December 30, 2019. Requires the Department to increase rates and reimbursements in effect on January 1, 2020 for community-based providers for persons with developmental disabilities in order to fund a minimum $2 per hour wage increase. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that the Departments of Human Services and Healthcare and Family Services may adopt emergency rules. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-DHS-DIRECT SUPPORT WAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1705 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4872&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4872.htm |