IL HB4847 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. In the expungement review provisions, provides that if the minor appears in person, or by counsel upon a showing that the minor respondent is unavailable due to active military duty or currently out of state attending school (rather than in all cases in which the minor appears in person or by counsel), the court shall hold a hearing to determine whether to expunge the law enforcement and court records of the minor. Provides that evidence of the minor's unavailability at the hearing includes, but is not limited to, a certified certificate of military enlistment, a certified statement of service, or an official school transcript. Effective immediately.
Title
JUV CT-EXPUNGEMENT-EVIDENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Juvenile Justice Reform Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner |