IL HB4823 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Small Business Job Creation Tax Credit Act. Creates a second set of incentive periods beginning on July 1, 2020 and ending on June 30, 2026. Provides that the credit shall not exceed $5,000 per employee hired. Provides that the maximum amount of credits allowed is $75,000,000. Effective immediately.
Title
SMALL BUSINESS-INCENTIVE
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 25 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 25 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4823&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4823.htm |