IL HB4811 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governmental Account Audit Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning reports to the Comptroller.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1019 |
2014-08-22 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2015 |
2014-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-001-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-001-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2014-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Syverson |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 012-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-002-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 310 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |