IL HB4796 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Requires a landlord to disclose all nonoptional fees in the lease agreement. Requires that the sum total of rent and all nonoptional fees must be described as the Total Monthly Payment and be listed on the first page of the lease. Requires that a unit advertised for a residential tenancy must disclose the nonoptional fees included with the total amount for rent in any advertisement or posting. Requires that the landlord disclose whether utilities are included in the rent in a lease agreement disclosure or unit advertisement. Provides that a landlord who violates this Section is liable to the residential tenant for treble damages, and the court may award the tenant reasonable attorney's fees.
Title
LANDLORD-TENANT RENT INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 017-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4796&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4796.htm |