IL HB4780 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Dental Loss Ratio Act. Sets forth provisions concerning dental loss ratio reporting. Provides that a health insurer or dental plan carrier that issues, sells, renews, or offers a specialized health insurance policy covering dental services shall, beginning January 1, 2025, annually submit to the Department of Insurance a dental loss ratio filing. Provides a formula for calculating minimum dental loss ratios. Sets forth provisions concerning minimum dental loss ratio requirements. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement the Act. Provides that the Act does not apply to an insurance policy issued, sold, renewed, or offered for health care services or coverage provided as a function of the State of Illinois Medicaid coverage for children or adults or disability insurance for covered benefits in the single specialized area of dental-only health care that pays benefits on a fixed benefit, cash payment-only basis. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DENTAL LOSS RATIO ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4780&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4780.htm |