IL HB4776 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a minor found to be guilty may be committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice if the minor is at least 14 (rather than 13) years and under 20 years of age, provided that the commitment to the Department of Juvenile Justice shall be made only if the minor was found guilty of a felony offense or first degree murder. Provides that when a minor of the age of at least 14 (rather than 13) years is adjudged delinquent for the offense of first degree murder, the court shall declare the minor a ward of the court and order the minor committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice until the minor's 21st birthday, without the possibility of aftercare release, furlough, or nonemergency authorized absence for a period of 5 years from the date the minor was committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice.
Title
JUV CT-SENTENCING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-21 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2024-03-20 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2024-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-006-000 |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-710 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-750 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4776&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4776.htm |