IL HB4764 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. In the predatory criminal sexual assault of a child statute, makes additional changes in the sentencing provisions for that offense. Provides that the court shall impose an additional 11 year sentence upon a person convicted of criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse if the victim of the criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse was under 18 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense. Amends the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act. Provides that the office of the State's Attorney shall provide an alleged victim of a sexual assault with a statement of the rights guaranteed by the Act and the Bill of Rights for Children and an explanation of those rights. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the court shall impose an extended term sentence upon any offender who has been convicted of a felony violation of the statutes concerning criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse if the victim of the criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, or aggravated criminal sexual abuse when the victim of the offense is under 18 years of age at the time of the commission of the offense and, during the commission or attempted commission of the offense, the victim was under the influence of alcohol, regardless of whether or not the alcohol was supplied by the accused.
Title
SEXUAL ASSAULT-PENALTY-RIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 001-002-000; LOST | |
2010-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-02-25 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-01-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2010-01-13 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-01-13 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-01-13 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-11 | First Reading | |
2010-01-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2010-01-07 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4764&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4764.htm |