IL HB4751 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Treasurer Act. Modifies and reorganizes the provisions of a Section concerning the College Savings Pool. Provides that the State Treasurer may establish and administer a College Savings Pool as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code, and that the Pool may consist of one or more college savings programs. Provides that the State Treasurer, in administering the College Savings Pool, may receive, hold, and invest moneys paid into the Pool and perform such other actions as are necessary to ensure that the Pool operates as a qualified tuition program under the Internal Revenue Code. Provides provisions concerning administration, availability, fees, and investment restrictions of the Pool. Modifies the way in which investments, distributions, contributions, and bonds are made regarding the Pool. Defines terms. Makes conforming, technical, and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
TREASURER-COLLEGE SAVINGS POOL
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0905 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 107-003-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-014-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 505 | 16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |