IL HB4742 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0813
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0813
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, by January 1, 2019, the State Board of Education shall implement a program and adopt rules to allow school districts to supplement their substitute teacher recruitment for elementary and secondary schools with the use of recruiting firms. Defines "recruiting firm". Specifies program requirements. Prohibits school districts from using recruiting firms to circumvent collective bargaining agreements or laws. Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the term "teacher" or "substitute teacher" does not include and service credit may not be granted to an individual employed by an entity that provides substitute teaching services under the program and is not a school district. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-THIRD PARTY SUB TEACHER
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0813 |
2018-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-009-009 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |