IL HB4741 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that an individual who turned 35 while serving as a member of the active or reserve components of any of the branches of the Armed Forces of the United States or the National Guard of any state, whose service was characterized as honorable or under honorable, and is currently under the age of 40 is eligible to take an examination for a position as a firefighter. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROTECTION DIST-AGE REQ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0995 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee; 017-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assigned to Public Safety: Police & Fire Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 16.06b | Amended Code | Citation Text |