IL HB4740 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Provides that the requirements for reinstatement of a domestic corporation after its administrative dissolution must be completed no later than 180 days after the administrative dissolution.
Title
BUS CORP-REINSTATE DEADLINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-004-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 5 | 12.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |