IL HB4733 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Senior Citizens and Disabled Persons Property Tax Relief and Pharmaceutical Assistance Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2011, "covered prescription drug" includes any prescription drug used in the treatment of multiple sclerosis that is covered by the Medicare Part D Prescription Drug Plan in which the beneficiary is enrolled. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIRCUIT BREAKR-COVERED RX DRUG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-09 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2010-01-04 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-01-04 First Reading
2009-12-23 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback