IL HB4731 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,444,500 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Universities Civil Service System for its operational expenses for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$UNIV-CIVIL SERVICE SYSTEM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4731&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4731.pdf |