IL HB4724 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that owners of a facility must submit a transition plan upon a change of ownership. Requires the transition plan to include a detailed explanation of how resident care and appropriate staffing levels shall be maintained until the license has been obtained and the transfer of facility operations occurs. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall not approve any change of ownership without a sufficient transition plan. Provides penalties for failure to provide a transition plan and ensure residents are provided adequate care during the change of ownership process. Provides that the transferor's liability includes failure to have a sufficient transition plan during the change of ownership process. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOME-CHANGE OF OWNER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 005-003-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |