IL HB4707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0989
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0989
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Changes the classification of Hydrocodone from a Schedule II controlled substance to a Schedule I controlled substance. Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987 to make a conforming change.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-HYDROCODONE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0989 |
2018-08-20 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2018 |
2018-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 101-006-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-002 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-001 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-003-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 80 | 15.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |