IL HB4696 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall offer to each successful purchaser of a hunting license that was obtained by online purchase and issued pursuant to the Wildlife Code the opportunity to be redirected to the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry website maintained by the Secretary of State.
Title
DNR-LICENSE-ORGAN DONOR INFO
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0950 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 801 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |