IL HB4694 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes changes to the information required on a voter registration record card. Provides that electronic voter registration records shall be furnished at a reasonable cost to any person who makes a sworn affidavit that the list will solely be used for bona fide election, scholarly, or journalistic purposes, as determined by the State Board of Elections. Provides that voter registration records shall be furnished without charge or at a reduced charge if the person requesting the records states the specific purpose for the request and indicates that a waiver or reduction of the fee is in the public interest. Provides that voter registration records or data shall not be placed for unrestricted access on the Internet. Provides that voter registration records or data shall not be furnished to any person residing outside of the United States and any person who knowingly does so shall be guilty of a Class 4 felony. Makes other changes.
Title
ELECT CD-VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 4-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4694&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4694.htm |