IL HB4674 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish by rule guidelines for required continuing education of all employees who inspect, survey, or evaluate a facility and to offer continuing education opportunities at least quarterly. Provides that the Department shall notify a facility and complainant of its findings regarding a complainant's complaint within 5 calendar days (rather than 10 days) of the determination. Provides that employees of a State or unit of local government agency charged with inspecting, surveying, or evaluating facilities are required to complete at least 10 hours of continuing education annually. Provides that if a facility is found to have violated any provision of the Act or rule adopted under the Act, the facility shall develop a plan of correction to address deficiencies indicated in a statement of deficiency. Requires the Department to approve or deny the plan of correction within 72 hours after receiving the plan of correction. Provides that the Department shall conduct an annual review of all survey activity from the preceding calendar year (rather than conduct an annual review) and make a report including specified information concerning the complaint and survey process. Contains other provisions.
Title
NURSING HOMES-INSPECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0947 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2022-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Hunter |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 010-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |