IL HB4671 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
Pending: House Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that beginning on and after January 1, 2025, a foster family home that includes a pregnant or parenting youth in care and any child of the parenting youth shall be eligible to receive additional foster care payments from the Department of Children and Family Services to cover all reasonable costs incurred by the foster family in caring for the pregnant or parenting youth and any child of the parenting youth. Provides that the parenting youth must be the full-time custodial parent of the child for whom the foster family is requesting additional payment. Permits the Department to prescribe by rule which costs and expenses qualify as "reasonable costs" eligible for payment. Grants the Department rulemaking authority. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
DCFS-FOSTER-PARENTING YOUTH
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4671&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4671.htm |