IL HB4666 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Act. Provides that the Governor is authorized and requested to issue a proclamation on Pedestrians with Disabilities Safety Day which: (i) reminds citizens, park districts, and other special recreation districts of the State (rather than only citizens) of the policies with respect to persons with disabilities and urges all citizens and governmental personnel (rather than only citizens) to ensure that the policies are upheld; and (ii) emphasize the need of all citizens and governmental personnel (rather than only citizens) to be aware of the presence of persons with disabilities in the community and to keep safe and functional for persons with disabilities the streets, sidewalks, highways, walkways, and walking, running, or bicycle paths of this State. Effective immediately.
Title
GOV: SAFETY DAY PROCLAMATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 60 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4666&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4666.htm |