IL HB4660 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mechanics Lien Act. Removes language providing for notice by a subcontractor for an owner-occupied single-family from a provision regarding notice by a contractor for an owner-occupied single-family. In a provision regarding subcontractor liens, requires the notice provided by the subcontractor to contain, in addition to other requirements, the type of labor, services, fixtures, apparatus or machinery, or forms or form work delivered and to be delivered. Makes other changes.
Title
MECHANICS LIEN-NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0827 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 60 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 60 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |