IL HB4655 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes concerning the allocation of compensation paid to nonresidents to provide that the allocation is based on the number of working days spent in this State. Makes corresponding changes concerning employer withholding requirements. Creates a credit in an amount equal to the amount of the investment made by the taxpayer during the taxable year in qualified property and qualified expenses that are used for tracking and reporting the location of resident and non-resident employees for purposes of compliance with the tracking, reporting, and income tax withholding requirements of the amendatory Act.
Title
INC TX-NONRESIDENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 227 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4655&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4655.htm |