IL HB4648 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act (2015). Defines terms. Provides procedures and requirements for the access and control by guardians, executors, agents, and other fiduciaries of the digital assets of persons who are deceased, under a legal disability, or subject to the terms of a trust. Adds provisions concerning: applicability; user direction for disclosure of digital assets; terms-of-service agreements; fiduciary duty and authority; custodian compliance and immunity; the Act's relation to federal laws governing electronic signatures; and severability. Makes corresponding changes in the Criminal Code of 2012.
Title
FIDUCIARY ACCESS-DIGITAL ASSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0775 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-000 |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-04-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-04-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 16D-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16D-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |