IL HB4634 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Manufacturing Illinois Chips for Real Opportunity (MICRO) Act. Creates the Manufacturing Illinois Chips for Real Opportunity (MICRO) Program to be administered by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Creates various tax incentives for manufacturers of semiconductors, microchips, or semiconductor or microchip component parts, subject to an agreement with the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Property Tax Code, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, the Electricity Excise Tax Law, and the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-MICROCHIPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 5n | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 238 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 239 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4634&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4634.htm |