IL HB4616 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Allows a school board to use remaining funds on hand in the Fire Prevention and Safety Fund for required safety inspections. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-FIRE PREV SAFETY FUND
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. David Luechtefeld [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1066 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-016-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 17-2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |