IL HB4592 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides for increased penalties for involuntary servitude if the victim was recruited, enticed, or obtained by any means from a shelter, safe house, or facility, including, but not limited to, a residential treatment center that serves runway youth, foster children, the homeless, or victims of trafficking, or those subjected to domestic violence or sexual assault. Provides that a person also commits the offense of involuntary sexual servitude of a minor when he or she knowingly recruits, entices, harbors, transports, provides, or obtains by any means, or attempts to recruit, entice, harbor, provide, or obtain by any means, another person under 18 years of age, knowing that the minor will engage in commercial sexual activity, a sexually-explicit performance, or the production of pornography, or causes or attempts to cause a minor to engage in one or more of those activities and the minor is under 18 years of age and was recruited, enticed, or obtained by any means from a shelter, safe house, or facility, including, but not limited to, a residential treatment center that serves runway youth, foster children, the homeless, or victims of trafficking, or those subjected to domestic violence or sexual assault. Provides that solicitation of a sexual act is a Class 4 felony and a second or subsequent offense is a Class 3 felony (rather than a Class A misdemeanor). Provides that solicitation of a sexual act from a person who is under 18 years of age or who is a person with a severe or profound intellectual disability is a Class 3 (rather than a Class 4) felony and a second or subsequent offense is a Class 2 felony.
Title
CRIM CD-HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Bos |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4592&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4592.htm |