IL HB4582 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for farm machinery and equipment also includes: bailing wire; twine (including sisal and polypropylene baler twine); bale wrap (also known as silage wrap or bale film); bunker covers (also known as silage film); silage bags; underlayments and oxygen barriers; gravel and sand bags; secure covers; bale bags, sleeves, and elastic tubes; baler wire; and netwrap. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-FARMING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-03-08 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4582&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4582.htm |