IL HB4581 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Illinois Juvenile Justice Commission in its annual submission of recommendation to the Governor and General Assembly shall include recommendations regarding the inclusion of emerging adults into a developmentally appropriate justice system, reducing recidivism, and preventing deeper criminal involvement. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides in the Article concerning delinquent minors that on and after January 1, 2019, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 19th birthday has committed a misdemeanor offense and has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law, or county or municipal ordinance. Provides that on and after January 1, 2021, "delinquent minor" includes a minor who prior to his or her 21st birthday has committed a misdemeanor offense and has violated or attempted to violate, regardless of where the act occurred, a federal law or State law or county or municipal ordinance. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply to violations or attempted violations committed on or after the effective of the amendatory Act.
Title
JUV COURT-DELINQUENT MINOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 17a-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |