IL HB4574 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Procurement of Domestic Products Act. Provides that the term "manufactured in the United States" means: (1) in the case of products that are not assembled articles, materials, or supplies, that the product is mined or produced in the United States; (2) in the case of assembled articles, materials, or supplies, that design, final assembly, processing, packaging, testing, or other process that adds value, quality, or reliability occurs in the United States and the cost of domestic components exceeds 50% of the cost of all of the components; or (3) that the product is a commercially available off-the-shelf item (currently, "that design, final assembly, processing, packaging, testing, or other process that adds value, quality, or reliability occurs in the United States"). Provides for an exception to the Act if the price of the procured products manufactured in the United States exceeds the price of available and comparable procured products manufactured outside the United States by 12% or more (currently, if the price of the procured products manufactured in the United States exceeds the price of available and comparable procured products manufactured outside the United States by an unreasonable amount). Effective immediately.
Title
PROCURE DOMESTIC PRODUCTS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-23 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-002-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 517 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 517 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4574&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4574.htm |