IL HB4570 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-17)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that subject to appropriation, the Department of Human Services shall award competitive grants under a Teen Responsibility, Education, Achievement, Caring, and Hope (Teen REACH) Grant Program to community-based agencies. Provides that successful grantees under the Teen REACH grant program shall plan and implement activities that address outcomes associated with 6 core services: (i) the improvement of educational performance; (ii) life skills education; (iii) parental education; (iv) recreation, sports, cultural, and artistic activities; (v) the development of positive adult mentors; and (vi) service learning opportunities. Provides that successful grantees under the Teen REACH grant program shall be in compliance with policies and procedures on program, data, and expense reporting as developed by the Department, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Management and Budget. Provides that the Department may adopt any rules necessary to implement the program.
Title
DHS-TEEN REACH GRANT PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4570&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4570.htm |