IL HB4563 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that any taxpayer that has been awarded an EDGE credit for a taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2014 may elect to claim up to 20% of the amount of the credit against its obligation to pay over withholding taxes. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
EDGE-WITHHOLDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 10 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 704A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4563&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4563.htm |