IL HB4562 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Park District Code. Provides that the Board may appoint an assistant secretary and an assistant treasurer, and if the secretary or treasurer are unable to perform their duties, then the assistant secretary or treasurer, as applicable, shall perform those duties. Further provides that the assistant secretary and assistant treasurer need not be members of the Board. Effective immediately.
Title
PARK DIST-SECRETARY/TREASURER
Sponsors
Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Sen. Maggie Crotty [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0758 |
2012-07-06 | House | Effective Date July 6, 2012 |
2012-07-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1205 | 4-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |