IL HB4553 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $43,597,015 from the General Revenue Fund to Northeastern Illinois University for its ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
$NEIU-OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4553&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/PDF/10300HB4553.pdf |