IL HB4532 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates the Pet Insurance Article of the Code. Defines terms. Requires a pet insurer to disclose coverage exclusions, limitations, waiting periods, and other information. Provides that pet insurance applicants shall have the right to examine and return the policy, certificate, or rider to the company or an agent or insurance producer of the company within 30 days of its receipt and to have the premium refunded if, after examination of the policy, certificate, or rider, the applicant is not satisfied for any reason. Provides that a pet insurer may issue policies that exclude coverage on the basis of one or more preexisting conditions with appropriate disclosure to the consumer. Provides that a pet insurer may issue policies that impose waiting periods upon effectuation of the policy that do not exceed 30 days for illnesses or orthopedic conditions not resulting from an accident. Prohibits waiting periods for accidents. Provides that no pet insurer or insurance producer shall market a wellness program as pet insurance. Sets forth provisions concerning wellness programs sold by a pet insurer or insurance producer.
Title
INS CD-PET INSURANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 1800 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1805 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1815 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1820 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 1825 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | Art. XLVIII head | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4532&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4532.htm |