IL HB4528 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rental Property Utility Service Act. Provides that a landlord shall repair any leaking water pipe of a tenant within 30 days of the landlord being notified of a leak. Provides that this requirement applies if the leaking water pipe is under the landlord's control, but it does not apply if the leaking water pipe is owned by a municipality or water utility. Provides that, if a landlord violates this provision and the tenant pays the water bill, the landlord is liable for any additional costs incurred by the tenant as a result of the water leak.
Title
RENTAL PROP-LEAKING WATER PIPE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Housing; 012-006-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Housing; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 735 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
765 | 735 | 2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |