IL HB4526 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Beginning January 1, 2013, authorizes the use of (i) perchloroethylene drycleaning machines that have only a primary control system, but only for the remainder of each machine's useful life and at the facility at which it is located on the effective date of the amendatory Act and (ii) perchloroethylene drycleaning machines that have primary and secondary control systems. Beginning January 1, 2014, prohibits a person from operating a drycleaning machine unless (i) a person with specified training is present at the facility during the machine's operation and (ii) certain secondary containment measures are in place. Requires manufacturers of drycleaning solvents or other cleaning agents used in drycleaning to provide the Agency with certain information about those products. Requires the Agency, by no later than January 1, 2016, to submit to the General Assembly a report on the impact to groundwater from newly discovered releases of perchloroethylene in the State. Defines "drycleaning", "drycleaning machine", "drycleaning solvents", "perchloroethylene drycleaning machine", "primary control system", "refrigerated condenser", and "secondary control system". Effective January 1, 2013.
Title
EPA-PERCHLOROETHYLENE BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1057 |
2012-08-24 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-015-000 |
2012-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environmental Health Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environmental Health Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-05-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-05-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-006-000 |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Environment; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Environment |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Environment |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-03-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-010-000 |
2012-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Mell |
2012-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 013-001-004 |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Environmental Health Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |