IL HB4507 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the fifth day of March of each year shall be designated as the Day of the Horse, to be observed throughout the State as a day to encourage citizens to honor and celebrate the role of equines in the history and character of Illinois, and to recognize the benefits of the equine industry to the economy, agriculture, tourism, and quality of life in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMEMORATIVE DATES-HORSE DAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 097-007-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-007-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-001
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2018-05-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2018-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018
2018-05-03SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-001
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5490195New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4507&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4507.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4507eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4507enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4507sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4507sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4507_04182018_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB4507_05292018_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4507sam002_05312018_046001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB4507sam001_05312018_046000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback