IL HB4506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Provides that stalking does not include an exercise of the right to free speech or assembly that is otherwise lawful or picketing that is otherwise lawful (rather than, "an exercise of the right to free speech or assembly that is otherwise lawful or picketing occurring at the workplace that is otherwise lawful and arises out of a bona fide labor dispute, including any controversy concerning wages, salaries, hours, working conditions or benefits, including health and welfare, sick leave, insurance, and pension or retirement provisions, the making or maintaining of collective bargaining agreements, and the terms to be included in those agreements"). Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits stalking when he or she knowingly engages in a course of conduct directed at a specific person, and he or she knows or should know that this course of conduct would cause a reasonable person to fear for his or her safety or the safety of a third person (rather than, in addition, to suffer other emotional distress). Provides that a person commits cyberstalking when he or she engages in a course of conduct using electronic communication directed at a specific person, and he or she knows or should know that would cause a reasonable person to fear for his or her safety (rather than, in addition, to suffer other emotional distress). Effective immediately.
Title
STALKING OFFENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 21 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |